+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
On February 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor