+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 454, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6132.).
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5046.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5097.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 5).
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 23, 2016: AB 2048 GRAY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 17, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2048 Gray By Cannella
- Yeas: 39
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2016: AB 2048 GRAY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 20
April 5, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Gray
Type:
Primary Sponsor