+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4376.).
On August 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4725.)
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
On March 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On February 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 28, 2020: Consent Calendar AB2046
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 30, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
June 8, 2020: AB 2046 Voepel Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
June 2, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
March 10, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor