+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5723.)
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5652.)
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 29, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor