+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 23).
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
- Measure version as amended on March 19 corrected.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
On February 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 23, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor