+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 647, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 7141.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 6082.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 5553.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
On February 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2018: AB 2037 Bonta Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
August 31, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2037 Bonta By Hernandez Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
August 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 30, 2018: AB 2037 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 4
March 20, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor