+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 812, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6630.).
On August 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5595.).
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5527.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
On February 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 27, 2018: AB 2034 KALRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 22, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2034 Kalra By Beall
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 19, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2018: AB 2034 KALRA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
March 20, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor