+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 6376.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5275.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 29).
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 4778.)
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 4).
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4448.)
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 29, 2016: AB 2031 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2031 Bonta By Beall
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
May 12, 2016: AB 2031 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor