+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On February 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On January 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 29.
On January 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor