+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 479, Statutes of 2022.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5053.).
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W., G.O. and GOV. & F.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
August 25, 2022: AB 2022 Ramos Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
August 24, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2022 Ramos et al. By Skinner
- Yeas: 40
August 11, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 8, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
June 20, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 26, 2022: AB 2022 Ramos Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor