+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 408, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6189.).
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5123.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 1).
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4594.)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29).
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On February 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2016: AB 2022 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 1
August 18, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2022 Gordon By Bates
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 1, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 15, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2016: AB 2022 GORDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 20, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 4
March 29, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor