+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.)
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On March 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor