+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4681.).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L., P.E. & R.
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4658.)
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On March 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and P.E. & R.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 8, 2022: Consent Calendar AB2015
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 29, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
June 14, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
May 12, 2022: AB 2015 Cooley Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 65
- Present/NV: 13
May 4, 2022: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
April 20, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
April 6, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Employment and Retirement] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor