+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 124, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5324.).
On August 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4381.).
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4699.)
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
On February 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On January 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 29.
On January 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2020: AB 2013 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 28, 2020: Special Consent AB2013
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 13, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 29, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 8, 2020: AB 2013 Irwin Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
June 3, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
May 18, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor