+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 689, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 6453.).
On August 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 5340.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 14. Page 5134.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 27).
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2016: AB 2013 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
August 24, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2013 Jones-Sawyer By Leno
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
June 1, 2016: AB 2013 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
May 27, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor