+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12).
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 12, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor