+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 806, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6673.).
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 28).
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4559.).
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17).
On June 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4599.)
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 28, 2014: Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
August 28, 2014: AB 2004 CHESBRO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 18, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2004 Chesbro By Evans
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
April 24, 2014: AB 2004 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
April 9, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 2, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor