+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 483, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6977.).
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 28).
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5593.).
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4899.)
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2018: AB 2000 KALRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 28, 2018: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 3
August 22, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2000 Kalra et al. By Wieckowski
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
April 26, 2018: AB 2000 KALRA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 21