+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1798.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On January 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
On January 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 2, 2015: AB 200 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
March 17, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1