+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 13).
On March 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 13, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor