+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 407, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 6193.).
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 5136.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 22).
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 8. Page 5222.)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (May 27).
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 24, 2016: AB 1995 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
August 18, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1995 Williams By Leyva
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
August 11, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
June 2, 2016: AB 1995 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 19, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor