+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 418, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 4727.).
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 5368.)
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 21, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1993 Fox By Block
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
August 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 30, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 11, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2014: AB 1993 FOX Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 4
April 23, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor