+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 580, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 6384.).
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 4713.).
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 25).
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 5166.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 25, 2014: AB 1990 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
August 21, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1990 Gordon By Evans
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2014: AB 1990 GORDON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 14, 2014: Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 9, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor