+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4756.)
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On March 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
On January 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 10, 2020: AB 1982 Cunningham Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
June 3, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2020: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3