+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 6
April 18, 2016: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor