+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6353.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5271.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4955.)
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4887.)
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 29, 2016: AB 1979 BIGELOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1979 Bigelow By Hueso
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 21, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: AB 1979 BIGELOW Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
May 11, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
April 20, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2016: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Commerce]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor