+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 430, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6352.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5285.).
On August 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4899.)
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 20, 2018: AB 1977 A & A.R. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By EGGMAN
- Yeas: 80
August 13, 2018: Special Consent AB1977 A. & A.R.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 2, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 12, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
April 26, 2018: AB 1977 A & A.R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 11, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor