+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 15.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5230.).
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 29).
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 13. Page 4704.)
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11).
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 27).
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2022: AB 1973 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 5
August 29, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1973 McCarty By Rubio
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2022: AB 1973 McCarty Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 14
May 11, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor