+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5094.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and V.A.
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2016: AB 1972 CHAU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 20
April 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
March 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor