+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 185, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 7. Page 5382.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7.).
On August 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 4855.)
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4746.)
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On January 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2020: AB 1969 Blanca Rubio Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 16
August 30, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1969 Blanca Rubio et al. By Rubio
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
August 13, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 8, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 15, 2020: AB 1969 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 11
June 3, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
May 21, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2