+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 861, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 6629.).
On August 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 5595.).
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 1. Page 5397.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 25).
- Coauthors revised.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3).
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 27, 2018: AB 1968 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 12
August 22, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1968 Low et al. By Allen
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
August 16, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 19, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 29, 2018: AB 1968 LOW Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 3, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor