+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 461, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6286.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6285.)
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4646.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4848.)
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 8).
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 21, 2014: AB 1967 PAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 20, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1967 Pan By Cannella
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2014: AB 1967 PAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
April 30, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 8, 2014: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor