+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 810, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 7140.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6082.).
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6007.)
- Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 0. Page 6007.)
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
- Ordered to the Senate.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4732.).
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4646.)
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 4).
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2018: AB 1966 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1966 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Reconsider
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1966 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 14
June 18, 2018: Consent Calendar AB1966 Aguiar-Curry
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2018: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
April 12, 2018: AB 1966 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 9
April 4, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor