+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On February 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 10, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15