+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5166.).
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5129.)
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
On January 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 6, 2018: Consent Calendar AB1954 Patterson et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 12, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 10, 2018: AB 1954 PATTERSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 2, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 9, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1