+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6290.).
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5228.).
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5231.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18).
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 25, 2016: AB 1952 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 22, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1952 Gordon By Moorlach
- Yeas: 39
August 11, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2016: AB 1952 GORDON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 20
April 18, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 6, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation]
- Yeas: 9