+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 19, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor