+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 552, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2946.).
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2508.).
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1103.)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
On January 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
On January 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 8, 2015: AB 195 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 4, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB195 Chau By Hancock
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 9, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 9, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 23, 2015: AB 195 CHAU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
April 15, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor