+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On August 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1858.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On January 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
On January 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 7, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
August 7, 2020: [First] hearing set for [08-07-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 7
May 23, 2019: AB 195 Patterson Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
May 16, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 18
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor