+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 858, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6362.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5276.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4561.)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4455.)
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 5).
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 29, 2016: AB 1945 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1945 Mark Stone By Mitchell
- Yeas: 39
June 14, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2016: AB 1945 STONE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 5, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor