+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (35)
On September 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 5. Page 7027.).
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 6010.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
On August 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 5549.).
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 20).
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 7. Page 5523.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 16).
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
On January 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2018: AB 1945 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 11
August 21, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1945 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Hueso
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
August 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2018: AB 1945 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 9
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1