+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.)
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4389.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4389.)
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
April 20, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor