+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 1187.)
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
On March 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (February 28).
On February 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
On January 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 6, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
June 6, 2017: [First] hearing set for [06-06-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2017: AB 194 PATTERSON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
April 5, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
February 28, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1