+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On March 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 10).
On March 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On January 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
On January 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor