+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4910.)
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 11).
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 25, 2022: AB 1935 Grayson Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 11, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
April 25, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor