+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6165.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6114.)
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4977.).
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18).
On April 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D.
On February 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
August 24, 2022: AB 1933 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 23, 2022: Special Consent AB1933
- Yeas: 40
August 11, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 26, 2022: AB 1933 Friedman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
April 27, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
April 18, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor