+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 511, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6437.).
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5309.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4953.).
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4887.)
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29).
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2016: AB 1924 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1924 Low By Leno Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 39
June 28, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 27, 2016: AB 1924 LOW Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
May 4, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
April 19, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
March 29, 2016: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor