+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 12.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5123.).
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
On May 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- (pending re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4359.)
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED.
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
August 25, 2022: AB 1918 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 10
August 25, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1918 Petrie-Norris et al. By Becker
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2022: AB 1918 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 6
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 26, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
April 26, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor