+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 16.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (7)
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 14, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
May 26, 2022: AB 1917 Levine Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 9
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 26, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor