+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & P.
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 19, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2016: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 16
April 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor